EP1990925 - LEAKAGE POWER REDUCTION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/46] | Leakage power reduction apparatus | ||
[2017/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2017/32] |
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuda, Atsushi@c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo, Inc. SANNO Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Okazaki, Hiroshi@c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. SANNO Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Narahashi, Shoichi@c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. SANNO Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2017/32] |
Former [2008/46] | 01 /
Fukuda, Atsushi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo, Inc. SANNO Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
Okazaki, Hiroshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. SANNO Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
Narahashi, Shoichi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc. SANNO Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2017/32] |
Former [2010/10] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/46] | Hoffmann, Eckart Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 08008552.5 | 07.05.2008 | [2008/46] | Priority number, date | JP20070122490 | 07.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007122490 | [2008/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1990925 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1990925 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1990925 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/52 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
H04B1/525 (EP,US);
H04B1/52 (KR);
H04B1/18 (KR);
H04B1/50 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2017/32] |
Former [2010/22] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERLUSTLEISTUNGSREDUZIERVORRICHTUNG | [2017/17] | English: | LEAKAGE POWER REDUCTION APPARATUS | [2017/17] | French: | APPAREIL DE RÉDUCTION DE LA PUISSANCE DE FUITE | [2017/17] |
Former [2008/46] | Verlustleistungsreduziervorrichtung | ||
Former [2008/46] | Leakage power reduction apparatus | ||
Former [2008/46] | Appareil de réduction de la puissance de fuite | Examination procedure | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 01.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.04.2017 | 30.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6507728 (WATANABE NOZOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-8 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 19 - line 65 * [Y] 9; | [DX]JPH09116459 (FUJITSU LTD) [DX] 1,6-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2853784 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [Y] 9 * figure 5 * * page 7, line 1 - line 30 * | Examination | EP1507341 | by applicant | JPH02151130 | JPH09116459 |