|
18.01.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
06.12.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2016 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.07.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2016 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.04.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
10.06.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.04.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.04.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Request for a change of address - opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
10.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Late/insufficient payment of the renewal fee without additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2008 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.08.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.06.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
9 |