EP1959506 - Method of manufacturing a semiconductor light-emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006-banchi Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Tomio 7435-11, Ishiki-cho Kagoshima-shi Kagoshima 890 / JP | 02 /
Sanada, Kenichi 1-7-1, Myoenji liyuin-cho Hioki-gun Kagoshima 899-25 / JP | 03 /
Koya, Kenichi, Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 7F Twin OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Fukuda, Yasuhiko 12008-1, Yobo Higashi-ichiki-cho Hioki-gun Kagoshima 899-23 / JP | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/34] | 01 /
Inoue, Tomio 7435-11, Ishiki-cho Kagoshima-shi Kagoshima 890 / JP | ||
02 /
Sanada, Kenichi 1-7-1, Myoenji liyuin-cho Hioki-gun Kagoshima 899-25 / JP | |||
03 /
Koya, Kenichi 2-28-66, Chuzan-cho Kagoshima-shi Kagoshima 891-01 / JP | |||
04 /
Fukuda, Yasuhiko 12008-1, Yobo Higashi-ichiki-cho Hioki-gun Kagoshima 899-23 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08010300.5 | 26.12.1997 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | JP19970018782 | 31.01.1997 Original published format: JP 1878297 | JP19970021124 | 04.02.1997 Original published format: JP 2112497 | JP19970302473 | 05.11.1997 Original published format: JP 30247397 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1959506 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
H01L33/40 (EP,US);
H01L33/32 (EP,US);
H01L33/38 (EP,US);
H01L33/62 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2224/06102 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48257 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49107 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L25/167 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01012 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01019 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01028 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01039 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01057 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12032 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48257, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/10253, H01L2924/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/34] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für eine lichtemittierende Halbleitervorrichtung | [2008/34] | English: | Method of manufacturing a semiconductor light-emitting device | [2008/34] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif électroluminescent à semi-conducteur | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/01] | 13.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97950445.3 / EP0921577 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970950445) is 24.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |