EP2138571 - Process for the preparation of multicellular spheroids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SpheroTec GmbH Am Klopferspitz 19 82152 Martinsried / DE | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayer, Barbara Altbachweg 7 87700 Memmingen / DE | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2017/15] |
Former [2010/01] | Stolmár, Matthias, et al Stolmár Scheele & Partner Patentanwälte Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08011629.6 | 26.06.2008 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2138571 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2138571 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
C12N5/0062 (EP,US);
C12N2503/02 (EP,US);
C12N2513/00 (US);
C12N2533/78 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2010/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, LI | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, LI | ||
Former [2010/36] | |||
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung mehrzelliger Sphäroide | [2010/01] | English: | Process for the preparation of multicellular spheroids | [2010/01] | French: | Procédé de préparation de sphéroïdes multicellulaires | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 31.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 19.02.2010 | Appeal received | 19.02.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.04.2010 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2008 | AT | 12.04.2017 | CY | 12.04.2017 | CZ | 12.04.2017 | DK | 12.04.2017 | EE | 12.04.2017 | ES | 12.04.2017 | FI | 12.04.2017 | HR | 12.04.2017 | IT | 12.04.2017 | LT | 12.04.2017 | LV | 12.04.2017 | MC | 12.04.2017 | NL | 12.04.2017 | PL | 12.04.2017 | PT | 12.04.2017 | RO | 12.04.2017 | SE | 12.04.2017 | SI | 12.04.2017 | SK | 12.04.2017 | TR | 12.04.2017 | IE | 26.06.2017 | LU | 26.06.2017 | MT | 26.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | BG | 12.07.2017 | NO | 12.07.2017 | GR | 13.07.2017 | IS | 12.08.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 26.06.2008 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
MT | 26.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.06.2008 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
MT | 26.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.06.2008 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
MT | 26.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
MT | 26.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.06.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.06.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 12.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03064635 (JAPAN TISSUE ENG CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [XY] - YAMADA K. ET AL., "Efficient induction of hepatocyte spheroids in a suspension culture using a water-soluble synthetic polymer as an artificial Matrix", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, JAPANESE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY / OUP, TOKYO, JP, (19980101), vol. 123, no. 6, ISSN 0021-924X, pages 1017 - 1023, XP002955752 [X] 1-10,12,13,15-20 * the whole document * [Y] 11,14 | [XY] - PARK K-H, "Improved long-term culture of hepatocytes in a hydrogel containing Arg-Gly-Asp (RGD)", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (2002), vol. 24, pages 1131 - 1135, XP009108470 [X] 1-10,12,13,15-20 * the whole document * [Y] 11,14 | [Y] - VINATIER C. ET AL., "A silanized hydroxypropyl methylcellulose hydrogel for the three-dimensional culture of chondrocytes", BIOMATERIALS, (200511), vol. 26, no. 33, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 6643 - 6651, XP004989121 [Y] 11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2005.04.057 | [Y] - YAMADA K. ET AL., "Enhanced cell aggregation and liver functions using polymers modified with a cell-specific ligand in primary hepatocyte cultures", JOURNAL OF BIOSCIENCE AND BIOENGINEERING, (199911), vol. 88, no. 5, ISSN 1389-1723, pages 557 - 562, XP002503414 [Y] 14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1723(00)87675-6 | [A] - XU F. ET AL., "Three-dimensional polymeric systems for cancer cell studies", CYTOTECHNOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20070731), vol. 54, no. 3, ISSN 1573-0778, pages 135 - 143, XP019525901 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10616-007-9065-4 | Examination | US6368858 | US2003119107 | US2004091460 | - MAYER K ET AL, "631 Tumor associated fibroblasts have a profound impact on drug sensitivity of gastric cancer cells", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER. SUPPLEMENT, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, (20040901), vol. 2, no. 8, doi:10.1016/S1359-6349(04)80639-6, ISSN 1359-6349, page 191, XP004640075 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6349(04)80639-6 | - JOKA M ET AL, "prediction of the therapeutic repsonse in colorectal cancer patients using spheroid microtumor technology", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, vol. 26, no. 15S, ISSN 0732-183X, page 22178, URL: http://meeting.ascopubs.org/cgi/content/abstract/26/15_suppl/22178, (20090108), XP002509449 | by applicant | US5153131 | US5153132 | US5153133 | US5155034 | US5155035 | WO9534637 | WO2004101743 | WO2005095585 | - J. HOLTFRETER, "A study of the mechanics of gastrulation", J. EXP. ZOOL., (1944), vol. 95, pages 171 - 212 | - A. MOSCANA, "Cell suspensions from organ rudiments of chick embryos", EXP. CELL RES., (1952), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-4827(52)90077-3, pages 535 - 539, XP024861130 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-4827(52)90077-3 | - A. MOSCANA, "The development in vitro of chimeric aggregates of dissociated embryonic chick and mouse cells", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA, (1957), vol. 43, pages 184 - 104 | - W. MUELLER-KLIESER, "Multicellular Spheroids", J. CANCER RES. CLIN. ONCOL., (1986), vol. 12, pages 101 - 122 | - J.M. YUHAS, "A simplified method for production and growth of multicellular tumor spheroids", CANCER. RES., (1977), vol. 37, pages 3639 - 3643 | - Bulletin of Experimental Biology and Medicine, SPRINGER, (1981), vol. 91, page 3 |