EP1992976 - Negative-lead optical zoom having four lens groups and a lens-prism in the first lens group [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Imaging Corp. 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2011/20] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Olympus Imaging Corporation 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kazuyuki Hosokawa c/o Intellectual Property Support Department Olympus Intellectual Property Services Co., Ltd. 2-3, Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8512 / JP | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08012761.6 | 15.09.2006 | [2008/47] | Priority number, date | JP20050273951 | 21.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005273951 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1992976 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1992976 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02B15/177, // G02B5/04 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
G02B13/0045 (EP,US);
G02B13/006 (EP,US);
G02B13/007 (EP,US);
G02B13/009 (EP,US);
G02B15/144511 (EP,US);
G02B5/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/47] | Title | German: | Zoomobjektiv mit vier Linsengruppen und mit einer ersten negativen Linsengruppe | [2008/47] | English: | Negative-lead optical zoom having four lens groups and a lens-prism in the first lens group | [2008/47] | French: | Zoom comportant quatre groupes avec premier groupe de puissance optique négative | [2008/47] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/26] | 20.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06019387.7 / EP1767977 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]US2004130647 (KUBA KEIICHI [JP]) [XD] 1,6-13 * paragraph [0205]; figures 3A-3C; example 2 * [Y] 2-5,14-17; | [Y]US2005018313 (KUBA KEIICHI [JP]) [Y] 2-5,14-17 * paragraph [0197]; figures 4A-4C; example 2 * | by applicant | US2004130647 |