|
14.08.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.06.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.06.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.10.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.11.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
21.09.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.02.2009 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2009 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.12.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2008 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |