EP2053721 - Rotating machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyata, Kenji Hitachi Ltd. Int. Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ishikawa, Yoshihisa Hitachi, Ltd. Int. Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ito, Motoya Hitachi, Ltd. Int. Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Enomoto, Yuji Hitachi, Ltd. Int. Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Koyama, Takayuki Hitachi, Ltd. Int. Prop. Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/18] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08014860.4 | 21.08.2008 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | JP20070274579 | 23.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007274579 | JP20080114764 | 25.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008114764 | [2009/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2053721 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/14 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
H02K1/145 (EP,US);
H02K1/243 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drehmaschine | [2009/18] | English: | Rotating machine | [2009/18] | French: | Machine rotative | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 08.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JP2007274579 | JP2008114764 |