EP2048459 - Refrigeration and/or freezer device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Hausgeräte Ochsenhausen GmbH Memminger Strasse 77 88416 Ochsenhausen / DE | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jendrusch, Holger, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Gimpelweg 12 88430 Rot an der Rot / DE | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08017561.5 | 07.10.2008 | [2009/16] | Priority number, date | DE20072014027U | 08.10.2007 Original published format: DE 202007014027 U | [2009/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2048459 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2048459 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F25C5/04 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
F25C5/22 (EP,US);
F25C2500/08 (EP,US);
F25C2600/02 (EP,US);
F25C5/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2016/16] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühl- und/oder Gefriergerät | [2009/16] | English: | Refrigeration and/or freezer device | [2009/16] | French: | Appareil de réfrigération et/ou de refroidissement | [2009/16] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 13.02.2016 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.03.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007084230 (KRAUSE ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0026] * [I] 6; | [XI]WO2007054166 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,8 * page 6, line 6 - line 13; figure 7; claims 12-14 * [I] 6; | [A]JP2006118770 (HOSHIZAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |