EP2039321 - Surface recording and generation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Straumann AG Peter Merian-Weg 12 4002 Basel / CH | [2010/03] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states etkon Centrum für dentale CAD/CAM-Technologie AG Lochhamer Schlag 6 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Gerhard Karwendelstrasse 7 86932 Pürgen / DE | 02 /
Holzner, Stephan Klosterstrasse 25a 82069 Schäftlarn / DE | 03 /
Mehl, Albert Roggersdorferstrasse 3 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 04 /
Gloger, Wolfgram Einsteinstrasse 7 82152 Planegg / DE | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/13] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08021006.5 | 08.11.2001 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | DE2000219033U | 08.11.2000 Original published format: DE 20019033 U | DE2001201227U | 24.01.2001 Original published format: DE 20101227 U | [2009/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2039321 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2039321 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | [2011/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2039321 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/25, A61C13/00, A61C13/12 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
G01B11/2518 (EP,US);
A61C13/0004 (EP,US);
A61C13/12 (EP,US);
A61C9/0053 (EP,US);
A61C9/004 (EP,US);
A61C9/0093 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/17] | G01B11/25, A61C13/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/13] | A61C13/00, A61C13/12, G01B11/25 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2009/13] | Title | German: | Oberflächenerfassung und Erzeugung | [2009/13] | English: | Surface recording and generation | [2009/13] | French: | Détermination et production de surface | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 02.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01993809.1 / EP1362218 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010993809) is 09.03.2005 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.01.2013 | DK | 02.01.2013 | FI | 02.01.2013 | IT | 02.01.2013 | MC | 02.01.2013 | NL | 02.01.2013 | SE | 02.01.2013 | TR | 02.01.2013 | GR | 03.04.2013 | ES | 13.04.2013 | PT | 02.05.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/33] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 02.01.2013 | |
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | FI | 02.01.2013 | |
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 02.01.2013 | |
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | SE | 02.01.2013 | |
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 02.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4339746 (ZEISER MARC JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 3,6* claim 13 *; | [A]US5527182 (WILLOUGHBY ANDREW J M [BS]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 58 - column 90, line 29 *; | [A]WO9926540 (KLEIN MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * pages 8-35 *; | [A]WO9959106 (ACUSCAPE INTERNATIONAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * pages 5-36 *; | [A]US6015289 (ANDREIKO CRAIG A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 31 - column 68, line 6 *; | [A]WO0019929 (ALIGN TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * pages 4-47 * | by applicant | DE4439307 | DE19721688 | EP19980115809 |