EP2196251 - Carbon dioxide separation device and method of operating such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graeber, Carsten Eifelweg 7 91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Zimmermann, Gerhard, Dr. Zeisigstrasse 11 91315 Höchstadt/Aisch / DE | [2010/24] | Application number, filing date | 08021089.1 | 04.12.2008 | [2010/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2196251 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/00, F25J3/06 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
B01D53/002 (EP);
F25J3/0625 (EP);
F25J3/067 (EP);
F25J3/0675 (EP);
B01D2257/504 (EP);
F25J2230/30 (EP);
F25J2230/32 (EP);
F25J2235/80 (EP);
F25J2240/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/08] |
Former [2010/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kohlendioxid-Abtrennanlage und Verfahren zum Betrieb einer solchen Anlage | [2010/24] | English: | Carbon dioxide separation device and method of operating such a device | [2010/24] | French: | Installation de séparation de dioxyde de carbone et procédé de fonctionnement d'une telle installation | [2010/24] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/24] | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9935455 (REDDY SATISH [US]) [X] 1-14,16-26 * page 1, lines 4,5 * * page 4, lines 1-15 * * page 7, lines 23-29 * * page 9, lines 11,12 * * page 16, lines 20-29 * * figures 2,8 * * claim 1 *; | [X]US2006260189 (REDDY SATISH [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * paragraphs [0008] , [0023] , [0032] , [0040] * * figures 3,4 * * claims 3,5,6 *; | [X]US3349571 (NEBGEN WILLIAM H) [X] 1,2,14,16,26 * column 1, lines 15-17 * * column 3, lines 71-74 * * column 4, lines 48-63 * * column 5, lines 1-13 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE2130774 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP) [X] 1,3,16,18,23,24 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 3 * * page 3, lines 23-29 * * page 4, lines 1-6 * * page 8, lines 1-6 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US3614872 (TASSONEY JOSEPH P, et al) [X] 1,3,16,18,23,24 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102007007581 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0010] * |