EP2075487 - Dual clutch transmission and vehicle comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/27] | Dual clutch transmission | ||
[2012/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG. CO., LTD. 2-18-1, Inadera Amagasaki-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2009/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishii, Norihiro c/o Kanzaki Kokyukoki Mfg. co. Ltd. 2-18-1 Inadera Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | [2012/48] |
Former [2009/27] | 01 /
Ishii, Norihiro c/o Kanzaki Kokyukoki Mfg. co. Ltd. 2-18-1 Inadera Amagasaki-shi Hyogo / JP | Representative(s) | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [2009/27] | Dieckhoff, Beate Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 D-52074 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08022230.0 | 22.12.2008 | [2009/27] | Priority number, date | JP20070341257 | 28.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007341257 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2075487 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2075487 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2075487 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/093, F16H61/688, F16H37/04 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
F16H3/006 (EP,US);
F16H37/043 (EP,US);
F16H61/0246 (EP,US);
F16H2037/045 (EP,US);
F16H2200/006 (EP,US);
F16H2200/0086 (EP,US);
F16H61/688 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19233 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19251 (EP,US);
Y10T74/1926 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/27] | F16H3/093 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2013/16] |
Former [2009/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Doppelkupplungsgetriebe und damit ausgestattetes Fahrzeug | [2012/46] | English: | Dual clutch transmission and vehicle comprising the same | [2012/46] | French: | Transmission à double embrayage et véhicule la comprenant | [2012/46] |
Former [2009/27] | Doppelkupplungsgetriebe | ||
Former [2009/27] | Dual clutch transmission | ||
Former [2009/27] | Transmission à embrayage double | Examination procedure | 11.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 15.09.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.04.2013 | FR | 31.12.2013 | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/11] | IT | 17.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]GB2186333 (AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 8-11,13,15 [Y] 5-7,12,14; | [XAY]DE10335262 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,11 * the whole document * [A] 8-10,13,15 [Y] 5-7,12,14; | [YA]EP0797025 (LANDINI SPA [IT]) [Y] 5-7 * the whole document * [A] 1-4; | [YA]EP0696695 (NEW HOLLAND ITALIA SPA [IT]) [Y] 5,12,14 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,6-11,13,15; | [A]DE3619329 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 23 - column 10, line 60; figure 1 *; | [A]US2007017309 (HASEGAWA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0153]; figures 7,10 * | by applicant | GB2186333 | JP2007218277 |