|
21.12.2015 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
07.12.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2015 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2015 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.05.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.09.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
24.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Communication on invalid designation/extension/validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.02.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2008 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Communication on invalid designation/extension/validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |