|
11.02.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.02.2021 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.02.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.01.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.01.2021 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.01.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.12.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2020 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2020 |
Communication pursuant to R.84(1) EPC: patent lapsed |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.10.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2020 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.07.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.07.2020 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2020 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.04.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.04.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2019 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2019 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.06.2016 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
20.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.01.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.02.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
54 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
122 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
23.07.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2010 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2009 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |