blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1975042

EP1975042 - Vehicle body structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.05.2012  [2012/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
2, Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2011/25]For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
Former [2008/40]For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Konishi, Masashi, c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd
Intellectual Property Department, 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / Saitou, Hidekazu, c/o Nissan Motor Co., Ltd
Intellectual Property Department, 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
 [2008/40]
Representative(s)Brochard, Pascale, et al
Osha Liang
32 Avenue de l'Opéra
75002 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/37]Brochard, Pascale, et al
Osha Liang 32 avenue de l'Opéra
75002 Paris / FR
Former [2008/40]Holmes, Matthew William
Nissan Motor Manufacturing (UK) Ltd Intellectual Property Department Cranfield Technology Park Moulsoe Road
Cranfield, Bedfordshire MK43 0DB / GB
Application number, filing date08153583.328.03.2008
[2008/40]
Priority number, dateJP2007009460530.03.2007         Original published format: JP 2007094605
[2008/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1975042
Date:01.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1975042
Date:02.09.2009
[2009/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1975042
Date:22.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2009
ClassificationIPC:B62D21/03, B62D25/20
[2008/40]
CPC:
B60N2/012 (EP,US); B60N2/015 (EP,US); B62D21/02 (KR);
B62D25/20 (EP,KR,US); B62D25/2027 (EP,US); B62D25/025 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2010/18]
Former [2008/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugaufbaukonstruktion[2008/40]
English:Vehicle body structure[2008/40]
French:Carrosserie de véhicule[2008/40]
Examination procedure02.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/14]
03.03.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
10.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2011Fee for grant paid
10.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.04.2010
Opposition(s)23.03.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]JP2006232237  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,4-11 * abstract * [A] 2;
 [X]FR2231215  (PEUGEOT & RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1,4,7-11 * claim 1 * * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 10; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]JP2002154459  (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [X] 1,4,6-11 * abstract *;
 [XA]JPH07246956  (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,4,6-11 * abstract * [A] 2;
 [AD]JP2003095130  (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1,8,10 * abstract *
by applicantJP2003095130
 JP2007094605
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.