EP2123766 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ETHANOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INEOS EUROPE LIMITED Hawkslease Chapel Lane Lyndhurst Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | King, Alex Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | King, Alex Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey KT16 8LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08156460.1 | 19.05.2008 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2123766 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/14, C12P7/08, C12P7/06 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C12P7/08 (EP);
C12P7/065 (EP);
C12P7/14 (EP);
Y02E50/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ethanol-Herstellung | [2009/48] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ETHANOL | [2009/48] | French: | Procédé pour production d'éthanol | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/17] | 17.12.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US5753474 (RAMEY DAVID EDWARD [US]); | [Y]WO0053791 (VERSER DAN [US], et al); | [Y]US6136577 (GADDY JAMES L [US]); | [DY]US2003211585 (GADDY JAMES L [US], et al); | [DY]US2007275447 (LEWIS RANDY S [US], et al); | by applicant | US5753474 | US5853474 | US2003211585 | US6817388 | US2006024801 | WO2007131241 | US2007275447 | WO2007143673 |