EP1995519 - Method for controlling the pressure dynamics and for estimating the life cycle of the combustion chamber of a gas turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NUOVO PIGNONE INTERNATIONAL S.r.l. Via Felice Matteucci, 2 50127 Florence / IT | [2020/46] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Nuovo Pignone S.p.A. 2, Via Felice Matteucci 50127 Florence / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asti, Antonio Via Matteucci, 2 50127, Florence / IT | [2020/15] |
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
Asti, Antonio Via Matteucci, 2 50127, Florence / IT | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/15] |
Former [2009/36] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2008/48] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08156638.2 | 21.05.2008 | [2008/48] | Priority number, date | IT2007MI01048 | 23.05.2007 Original published format: IT MI20071048 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1995519 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1995519 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1995519 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F23N3/00, F23N5/00 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
F23R3/34 (EP,US);
F01D19/00 (KR);
F02C9/00 (KR);
F23N3/002 (EP,US);
F23N5/00 (EP,US);
F23N2225/04 (EP,US);
F23N2241/20 (EP,US);
F23N5/16 (EP,US);
F23R2900/00005 (EP,US);
F23R2900/00013 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/10] |
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung der Druckdynamik und zur Einschätzung des Lebenszyklus der Verbrennungskammer einer Gasturbine | [2008/48] | English: | Method for controlling the pressure dynamics and for estimating the life cycle of the combustion chamber of a gas turbine | [2008/48] | French: | Procédé de régulation de la dynamique de pression et d'estimation de la durée de vie de la chambre de combustion d'une turbine à gaz | [2008/48] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 07.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.09.2019 | 03.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2008 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | ES | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | IT | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | NL | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | TR | 08.04.2020 | IE | 21.05.2020 | LU | 21.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | FR | 08.06.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | GB | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 21.05.2020 | ||
LU | 21.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 08.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GB | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 21.05.2020 | ||
LU | 21.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 08.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GB | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 21.05.2020 | ||
LU | 21.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GB | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 21.05.2020 | ||
LU | 21.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | CZ | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
LU | 21.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 08.04.2020 | |
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006266045 (BOLLHALDER HEINZ [CH], et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0018] , [0 24] , [0 35]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2005273277 (RIDNOUR JAMES A [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0134] , [ 155] - [0157] - [ 348]; figure 93; claim 12 *; | [Y]WO2006082210 (ENEL PRODUZIONE SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 4 * page 4, lines 13-16 *; | [A] - J. Keisler, O. K. Chopra, W. J. Shack, "Fatigue Strain-Life Behavior of Carbon and Low-Alloy Steels, Austenitic Stainless Steels, and Alloy 600 in LWR Environments", vol. NUREG/CR-6335, (19950802), pages FP - 7, Argonne National Laboratory, URL: http://www.iaea.org/inis/collection/NCLCollectionStore/_Public/27/004/27004400.pdf, (20170504), XP002770109 [A] 2 * pages 6-7, paragraph 3.1.1 * | Examination | US2004123653 | - W. Beith, K.-H. Grote, Dubbel Taschenbuch für den Maschinenbau, Springer, (1997), vol. 19th ed., ISBN 3-540-62467-8 |