EP2144420 - Web application security filtering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barracuda Networks AG Hardturmstrasse 181 8005 Zürich / CH | [2010/46] |
Former [2010/31] | For all designated states phion AG Hardturmstrasse 181 8005 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states phion AG Ottikerstrasse 59 8006 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osterwalder, Cyrill Visonys AG, Rheinfallstrasse 4 8447 Dachsen / CH | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Stocker, Kurt Büchel, von Révy & Partner Zedernpark Bronschhoferstrasse 31 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Stocker, Kurt Büchel, von Révy & Partner Zedernpark Bronschhoferstrasse 31 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 08159796.5 | 07.07.2008 | [2010/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2144420 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2144420 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
H04L63/0245 (EP,US);
H04L63/1441 (EP,US);
H04L63/168 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsfilterung für eine Internetanwendung | [2010/02] | English: | Web application security filtering | [2010/02] | French: | Filtrage de sécurité d'application Web | [2010/02] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.06.2011 | BE | 22.06.2011 | CY | 22.06.2011 | CZ | 22.06.2011 | DK | 22.06.2011 | EE | 22.06.2011 | FI | 22.06.2011 | HR | 22.06.2011 | HU | 22.06.2011 | IT | 22.06.2011 | LT | 22.06.2011 | LV | 22.06.2011 | MT | 22.06.2011 | NL | 22.06.2011 | PL | 22.06.2011 | RO | 22.06.2011 | SE | 22.06.2011 | SI | 22.06.2011 | SK | 22.06.2011 | TR | 22.06.2011 | IE | 07.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | BG | 22.09.2011 | NO | 22.09.2011 | GR | 23.09.2011 | ES | 03.10.2011 | IS | 22.10.2011 | PT | 24.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
TR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 07.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 07.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 07.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 07.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
HR | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 22.06.2011 | |
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
NO | 22.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 22.06.2011 | |
NO | 22.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6915454 (MOORE ANTHONY J [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 2, lines 34-47 * * column 4, lines 15-50 * * column 12, line 21 - column 19, line 20 *; | [A]US2006288220 (PENNINGTON BILL [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraphs [0065] - [0069] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraphs [0097] - [0101] *; | [E]US2008256612 (ROY PATRICK [CA], et al) [E] 1-7 * paragraph [0017] ** paragraphs [0050] - [0073] *; | [A] - SCOTT D ET AL, "Specifying and Enforcing Application-Level Wweb Security Policies", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON KNOWLEDGE AND DATA ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20030701), vol. 15, no. 4, ISSN 1041-4347, pages 771 - 783, XP003005117 [A] 1-7 * section 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TKDE.2003.1208998 | by applicant | US2003154296 | US6915454 | - SCOTT D. ET AL., "Specifying and Enforcing Application-Level Web Security Policies", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON KNOWLEDGE AND DATA ENGINEERING, (20030701), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1109/TKDE.2003.1208998, pages 771 - 783, XP003005117 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TKDE.2003.1208998 |