EP2146541 - Apparatus and method for performing network scanning using black-list network information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Islam, M. Khaledul 88 Broughton Street Ottawa, Ontario K2K 3N4 / CA | 02 /
Hossain, Asif 46 Knudson Drive Kanata Ontario K2K 2L6 / CA | [2016/27] |
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
Islam, M. Khaledul 88 Broughton Street Ottawa, Ontario K2K 3N4 / CA | ||
02 /
Hossain, Asif 46 Knudson Drive Kanata Ontario K2K 2L6 / CA | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2016/27] |
Former [2010/03] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08160765.7 | 18.07.2008 | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2146541 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2146541 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W8/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/27] |
Former [2010/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 18.07.2008 | BA | 18.07.2008 | MK | 18.07.2008 | RS | 18.07.2008 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Durchführung von Netzabtastung mittels Netzinformationen einer schwarzen Liste | [2010/03] | English: | Apparatus and method for performing network scanning using black-list network information | [2010/03] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour la réalisation du balayage de réseau à l'aide d'informations de réseau en liste noire | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2008 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 12.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2008 | AT | 06.07.2016 | BE | 06.07.2016 | CY | 06.07.2016 | CZ | 06.07.2016 | DK | 06.07.2016 | EE | 06.07.2016 | ES | 06.07.2016 | FI | 06.07.2016 | HR | 06.07.2016 | IT | 06.07.2016 | LT | 06.07.2016 | LV | 06.07.2016 | MC | 06.07.2016 | PL | 06.07.2016 | RO | 06.07.2016 | SE | 06.07.2016 | SI | 06.07.2016 | SK | 06.07.2016 | TR | 06.07.2016 | IE | 18.07.2016 | LU | 18.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | BG | 06.10.2016 | NO | 06.10.2016 | GR | 07.10.2016 | IS | 06.11.2016 | PT | 07.11.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.07.2008 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
TR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.07.2008 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
LU | 18.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 18.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 06.07.2016 | |
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 31.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1830596 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [0027] , [0031] *; | [X]EP1858278 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] - [0026] - [0029] *; | [AD]EP1739990 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [AD] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]WO0221875 (ERICSSON INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 4, line 11 - line 19; claims 1,4,5 *; | [A]EP1921882 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]US2005282544 (OOMMEN PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract *; | [A]WO0162034 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1830596 | EP1858278 | US2007004408 | US2006245392 | US2006246899 |