|
26.02.2015 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2015 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
12.12.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
12.12.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2014 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.08.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Statement of grounds |
Appeal |
12 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
06.07.2011 |
Statement of grounds |
Appeal |
12 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.01.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |