EP2080792 - Water soluble photo-curable antistatic composition with improved wear resistance and high transparency, and conductive hard tile flooring material coated with the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kim, Chae-Ho 28-1 Gwacheon-dong Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 427-060 / KR | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/07] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/30] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 08163368.7 | 01.09.2008 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | KR20080005258 | 17.01.2008 Original published format: KR 20080005258 | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2080792 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2080792 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2080792 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/24, C09D7/12, C08K3/04, C09D4/06 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
C09D4/06 (EP,US);
C09D5/24 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/70 (EP,US);
C09D4/00 (KR);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
C09D7/62 (EP,US);
E04F15/00 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (KR);
C08K3/041 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/50] | C09D5/24, C09D7/12, B05D3/06, B32B27/16, C09D4/06 | ||
Former IPC [2009/30] | C09D5/24, C09D7/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IE, IT [2018/07] |
Former [2010/34] | DE, FR, IE, IT | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wasserlösliche, lichthärtbare, antistatische Zusammensetzung mit verbesserter Verschleißbeständigkeit und hoher Transparenz und damit beschichtetes leitfähiges Hartfliesenbodenmaterial | [2009/30] | English: | Water soluble photo-curable antistatic composition with improved wear resistance and high transparency, and conductive hard tile flooring material coated with the same | [2009/30] | French: | Composition antistatique photo-durcissable soluble dans l'eau avec une résistance à l'usure améliorée et une transparence élevée, et un matériau de plancher à carreaux conducteur recouvert de celle-ci | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 17.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.02.2018 | IE | 01.09.2018 | FR | 30.09.2018 | [2019/38] |
Former [2019/33] | IT | 14.02.2018 | |
IE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | IT | 14.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2006045384 ; | [A]US5516546 (HARI SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [I]WO2006040398 (NANOLAB SYSTEMS OY [FI], et al) [I] 1-5 * claims 6,59,62 * * page 29, paragraph 2 *; | [A]EP1764382 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-5 * claim 7 * * paragraph [0007] *; | [A]US2007166523 (FUKAYA TOMOMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * examples 6,7 * * claims 4,20,23 *; | [I] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 18, Database accession no. 2006-168238, XP002553327 & JP2006045384 A 20060216 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO LTD) [I] 1-5 * abstract * | by applicant | KR100246036B | KR100373207B | KR20030025914 | KR100427554B | KR100589279B |