EP2039975 - Radial turning execution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GAT Gesellschaft für Antriebstechnik mbH Schossbergstrasse 19 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | [2009/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFF, Dennis Elsa-Brandström-Str. 25 55124, Mainz / DE | 02 /
OTT, Stephan Dahlienweg 3 65201, Wiesbaden / DE | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2014/09] |
Former [2009/13] | Lieke, Winfried, et al WSL Patentanwälte Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 08163709.2 | 04.09.2008 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | DE20071043026 | 11.09.2007 Original published format: DE102007043026 | [2009/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2039975 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2039975 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16L39/06, F16L27/087 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
F16L27/087 (EP,US);
F16L39/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/13] | F16L39/06 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2014/43] |
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Radiale Drehdurchführung | [2009/13] | English: | Radial turning execution | [2009/13] | French: | Exécution de rotation radiale | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/10] | 09.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE19621020 (GLYCO ANTRIEBSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-12 * column 5 - column 8; figure - * [Y] 6-8 [I] 3; | [X]WO0208649 (FMC TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [X] 1-5,12 * page 11 - page 32; figure - *; | [X]DE2655247 (LEIDENFROST REINHOLD ING GRAD) [X] 1-5,12 * page 9 - page 14; figure - *; | [X]US2308137 (WHITE FRED L) [X] 1-5,12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2557498 (COLLENDER GUSTAVE A) [X] 1-5,12 * column 2 - column 4; figure - *; | [YA]DE3738305 (STROMAG MASCHF [DE]) [Y] 6-8 * column 2 - column 3; figure - * [A] 1 |