EP2037138 - Device for supporting and handling equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alusic S.r.l. Via Bologna, 10/A 12084 Mondovi' / IT | [2009/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denegri, Luisa Via Borzini 1 12084 Mondovi' / IT | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2013/23] |
Former [2009/12] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 08164300.9 | 12.09.2008 | [2009/12] | Priority number, date | IT2007TO00645 | 13.09.2007 Original published format: IT TO20070645 | [2009/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2037138 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2037138 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16C29/04, F16C29/00, B23Q1/01, B23Q1/40, B23Q1/58 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
F16C29/004 (EP);
F16C29/005 (EP);
F16C29/045 (EP);
F16C29/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Stütze und Handhabung von Geräten | [2009/12] | English: | Device for supporting and handling equipment | [2009/12] | French: | Dispositif de support et de manipulation d'un équipement | [2009/12] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 01.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19807734 (NEFF ANTRIEBSTECH AUTOMATION [DE]) [X] 1,3-6 * column 1, line 5 - line 14 * * column 4, line 24 - column 6, line 49 * * figures 2,3,4 * [A] 11; | [X]DE10008700 (BAHR MODULTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4-6,9-11 * column 3, line 4 - line 56 * * figure 1 *; | [I]DE3921858 (SCHOCK METALLWERK [DE]) [I] 1-4,7,8 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 42 * * figure 1 * |