|
26.04.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2016 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
07.12.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
07.12.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.2015 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.07.2015 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
55 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2015 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
15 |
|
02.04.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2014 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2012 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
33 |
|
27.06.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2011 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.11.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.03.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2008 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.11.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |