EP2086132 - Optical amplification apparatus, optical communication apparatus, and optical communication method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onaka, Miki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Sugaya, Yasushi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Fukushi, Togo c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Kondoh, Masanori c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Noheji, Kiyotoshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 06 /
Hayasaka, Takashi c/o TST, Inc. Midtown Tower 28F 7-1, Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-6228 / JP | [2016/39] |
Former [2009/32] | 01 /
Onaka, Miki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Naka Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Sugaya, Yasushi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Naka Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
Fukushi, Togo c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Naka Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
04 /
Kondoh, Masanori c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Naka Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
05 /
Noheji, Kiyotoshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Naka Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
06 /
Hayasaka, Takashi c/o TST, Inc. Midtown Tower 28F 7-1 Akasaka 9-chom Tokyo 107-6228 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/46] |
Former [2009/32] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08165364.4 | 29.09.2008 | [2009/32] | Priority number, date | JP20080024231 | 04.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008024231 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2086132 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2086132 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/079, H04B10/293 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
H04B10/2931 (EP,US);
H04B10/07953 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | H04B10/17, H04B10/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/46] |
Former [2010/15] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optische Verstärkungsvorrichtung, optische Kommunikationsvorrichtung und optisches Kommunikationsverfahren | [2009/32] | English: | Optical amplification apparatus, optical communication apparatus, and optical communication method | [2009/32] | French: | Appareil d'amplification optique, système de communication optique et procédé de communication optique | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 06.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1130802 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [DA]EP1427075 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [DA] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]JP2004193640 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [DA] 1-5 * abstract ** figure 1 *; | [DX]US2005024712 (HIRAIZUMI MAKI [JP]) [DX] 1-5 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0139] - [0159] * * claim 19 * * figures 7,8,15 * | by applicant | EP1130802 | US2005024712 | JP2006189465 | JP2008024231 |