EP2045936 - Digital broadcasting system and method for transmitting and receiving electronic service guide (ESG) data in digital broadcasting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Sun-Mi c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Hyun-Chul c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Young-Jip c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Byoung-Dai c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Bae, Young-Kyu c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/01] |
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
Kim, Sun-Mi c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Kim, Hyun-Chul c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Young-Jip c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Lee, Byoung-Dai c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Bae, Young-Kyu c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Birchenough, Lewis, et al HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | [2015/01] |
Former [2013/32] | Birchenough, Lewis, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/15] | Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 08165853.6 | 03.10.2008 | [2009/15] | Priority number, date | KR20070100491 | 05.10.2007 Original published format: KR 20070100491 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2045936 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2045936 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2045936 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04H60/72 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
H04H60/72 (EP,US);
H04N7/08 (KR);
H04N21/23614 (EP,US);
H04N21/2362 (EP,US);
H04N21/26283 (EP,US);
H04N21/4348 (EP,US);
H04N21/83555 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N7/015 (KR);
H04N7/12 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/16] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Digitales Rundfunksystem und Verfahren zum Senden und Empfangen von elektronischen Dienstführerdaten (ESG) in einem digitalen Rundfunksystem | [2009/15] | English: | Digital broadcasting system and method for transmitting and receiving electronic service guide (ESG) data in digital broadcasting system | [2009/15] | French: | Système de diffusion numérique et procédé pour transmettre et recevoir des données de guide de services électroniques (ESG) dans un système de diffusion numérique | [2009/15] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 09.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.03.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.07.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1753166 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [[0065]] - paragraph [[0066]]; tables 8-14 *; | [A]EP1755274 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * tables 3-11 *; | [XY]WO2007042907 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,5 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,6-9; | [Y] - Open Mobile Alliance, "Service Guide for Mobile Broadcast Services Candidate Version 1.0", (20070925), URL: http://member.openmobilealliance.org/ftp/Public_documents/bcast/Permanent_documents/OMA-TS-BCAST_Service_Guide-V1_0-20070925-C.zip, (20110610), XP002641545 [Y] 2-4,6-9 * 5.1.2.1 Service 5.1.2.3 Content 5.1.2.4 Access * | [A] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "39 ESG-Datamodel.pdf", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20040924), XP017804889 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "tm-cbms1199_ESGSpec_050419.doc", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20050425), XP017805566 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "OMA-BCAST-2005-0338R03-ESG-Datamodel-Comparison-OMA-DVB.doc", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20051127), XP017804942 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2007042907 |