EP2072218 - Kneading screw and extruder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26, Wakinohama-cho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Narukawa, Yutaka c/o Takasago Works in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 3-1, Shinha Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8670 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Yoshimitsu c/o Takasago Works in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 3-1, Shinha Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8670 / JP | [2017/12] |
Former [2009/26] | 01 /
Narukawa, Yutaka c/o Takasago Works in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 3-1, Shinha Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8670 / JP | ||
02 /
Tanaka, Yoshimitsu c/o Takasago Works in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 3-1, Shinha Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8670 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2017/12] |
Former [2009/26] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08169021.6 | 13.11.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | JP20070327383 | 19.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007327383 | [2009/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2072218 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2072218 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2072218 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/50, B29C47/60, // B29C47/40, B29B7/38 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
B29C48/395 (EP,US);
B29B7/483 (EP);
B29B7/489 (EP);
B29C48/402 (EP,US);
B29C2948/9279 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/26] | B29C47/40, B29C47/64 | Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2015/05] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Knetschnecke und Extruder | [2009/26] | English: | Kneading screw and extruder | [2009/26] | French: | Vis de malaxage et extrudeuse | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/26] | 22.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.02.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.10.2016 | 25.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE10050295 (BUEHLER AG [CH]) [X] 1-6,9 * figure 2b; claims 1,13 * [I] 7,8; | [XI]US2003128624 (INOUE KIMIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9 * paragraphs [0009] , [0052] , [0120]; figures 8,9 * [I] 7,8; | [XI]JP2004202871 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD) [X] 1-6,9 * paragraph [0001]; figure 1 *[I] 7,8; | [XI]DE102006014692 (BERSTORFF GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,9 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0017] , [0018] , [0030]; figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 7,8 | Examination | - N. N., "JP2004202871A -SCREW FOR KNEADING EXTRUDER", (20040101), pages 1 - 4, XP055304668 | by applicant | JP2000296517 |