EP2078616 - Writing component comprising a porous nib [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société BIC 14, rue Jeanne d'Asnières 92110 Clichy / FR | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bedhome, Vincent 64 bis, Route de Crémarest 62240 Desvres / FR | 02 /
Cooper, Kenneth, R. 854 Racebrook Road Orange, CT 06477 / US | 03 /
Edgerley, David, A. 3 Honeybourne Road London NW6 IHH / GB | 04 /
Hungeford, Douglas 55 Brandywine Place Southington, CT 06489 / US | 05 /
Lange, Didier 2 allée des Courlis 62360 Saint Leonard / FR | 06 /
Matthews, Robert 7 Greenside Road London W12 9JQ / GB | 07 /
Rolion, Franck 14 ruelle du Crocq 95270 Asnieres sur Oise / FR | 08 /
Wlodarczyk, Anthony 13473 Canyon View Dr. Yucaipa, CA 93299 / US | 09 /
Eddington, Ryan 750 West Fourth Street Dallas City, IL 62330 / US | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08172015.3 | 10.11.2004 | [2009/29] | Priority number, date | US20030706315 | 11.11.2003 Original published format: US 706315 | US20040828020 | 19.04.2004 Original published format: US 828020 | [2009/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2078616 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2078616 | Date: | 03.02.2010 | [2010/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B43K1/00, B43K5/14, B43K8/02, B43K8/03, B43K23/08, B43K23/12, B43K24/14, B43K24/16, B43K25/02, B43K27/02, B43K27/08, B43K29/05, B43L19/00, B43M11/06 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
B43L19/0018 (EP,US);
B43K1/006 (EP,US);
B43K21/006 (EP,US);
B43K23/08 (EP,US);
B43K23/126 (EP,US);
B43K24/14 (EP,US);
B43K24/16 (EP,US);
B43K25/022 (EP,US);
B43K27/02 (EP,US);
B43K27/08 (EP,US);
B43K29/05 (EP,US);
B43K5/005 (EP,US);
B43K5/14 (EP,US);
B43K7/005 (EP,US);
B43K8/003 (EP,US);
B43K8/02 (EP,US);
B43K8/03 (EP,US);
B43L19/0081 (EP,US);
B43M11/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [2009/29] | Title | German: | Schreibkomponente mit poröser Spitze | [2009/29] | English: | Writing component comprising a porous nib | [2009/29] | French: | Composant d'écriture comprenant une pointe poreuse | [2009/29] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 24.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, GR, IT | 18.10.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04810763.5 / EP1684992 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1050417 (UNIVERSAL SPA [IT]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [XI]US6213661 (COON GEORGE [US]) [X] 1,10-14 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 60 - column 6, line 5; figures 1-10 * [I] 2-9; | [A]US2001004429 (MITO YOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US6497524 (KIM JOUNG CHUL [KR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4580918 | US5026189 |