EP2198709 - Method for treating resistant animal pests [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Gebäude 6100 Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Gebäude 6100 Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08172232.4 | 19.12.2008 | [2010/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2198709 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/08, A01N43/40, A01N43/54, A01N43/58, A01N43/78, A01P7/02, A01P7/04 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
A01N43/40 (EP);
A01N43/60 (EP);
A01N43/78 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bekämpfung resistenter tierischer Schädlinge | [2010/25] | English: | Method for treating resistant animal pests | [2010/25] | French: | Procédé destiné à lutter contre des parasites animaux résistants | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2011/07] | 23.07.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008040445 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 16, line 32 - page 17, line 6 * * page 1; compound (I) *; | [X]WO2007115643 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 1; figure (I) * * page 34, line 26 - page 37, line 4 *; | [DX]WO2007115644 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1-7 * page 25, line 17 - line 25 * * page 48, line 13 - line 19 * * page 51; example 1 * | by applicant | EP0539588 | WO2006037475 | WO2007115643 | WO2007115644 | WO2007115646 | WO2007068355 | US4272417 | US4245432 | US4808430 | US5876739 | US2003176428 | WO02080675 | WO0228186 | WO9205251 | WO9509910 | WO9827806 | WO2005002324 | WO2006021972 | US6229072 | WO8910396 | WO9102069 | WO0166704 | EP0837944 | WO0066746 | WO0066747 | WO0226995 | US5776760 | US5463175 | WO0236782 | WO03092360 | WO2005012515 | WO2007024782 | WO0124615 | WO03013226 | US5561236 | US5648477 | US5646024 | US5273894 | US5637489 | US5276268 | US5739082 | US5908810 | US7112665 | WO9638567 | WO9924585 | WO9924586 | WO9934008 | WO0236787 | WO2004024928 | US5605011 | US5378824 | US5141870 | US5013659 | US5767361 | US5731180 | US5304732 | US4761373 | US5331107 | US5928937 | WO9633270 | WO2004040012 | WO2004106529 | WO2005020673 | WO2005093093 | WO2006007373 | WO2006015376 | WO2006024351 | WO2006060634 | US5084082 | WO9741218 | US5773702 | WO9957965 | US5198599 | WO0165922 | WO2007027777 | WO9421795 | WO0004173 | WO2004090140 | WO2006133827 | EP0571427 | WO9504826 | EP0719338 | WO9615248 | WO9619581 | WO9627674 | WO9711188 | WO9726362 | WO9732985 | WO9742328 | WO9744472 | WO9745545 | WO9827212 | WO9840503 | WO9958688 | WO9958690 | WO9958654 | WO0008184 | WO0008185 | WO0028052 | WO0077229 | WO0112782 | WO0112826 | WO02101059 | WO03071860 | WO2004056999 | WO2005030942 | WO2005030941 | WO2005095632 | WO2005095617 | WO2005095619 | WO2005095618 | WO2005123927 | WO2006018319 | WO2006103107 | WO2006108702 | WO2007009823 | WO0022140 | WO2006063862 | WO2006072603 | WO0234923 | EP6090134 | EP6090228 | EP6090227 | EP7090007 | EP7090009 | WO0114569 | WO02079410 | WO03033540 | WO2004078983 | WO0119975 | WO9526407 | WO9634968 | WO9820145 | WO9912950 | WO9966050 | WO9953072 | US6734341 | WO0011192 | WO9822604 | WO9832326 | WO0198509 | WO2005002359 | US5824790 | US6013861 | WO9404693 | WO9409144 | WO9411520 | WO9535026 | WO9720936 | EP0663956 | WO9601904 | WO9839460 | WO9924593 | WO9531553 | US2002031826 | US6284479 | US5712107 | WO9747806 | WO9747807 | WO9747808 | WO0014249 | WO0073422 | WO0047727 | EP6077301 | US5908975 | EP0728213 | WO2006032538 | WO2007039314 | WO2007039315 | WO2007039316 | JP2006304779 | WO2005012529 | WO9800549 | WO2004053219 | WO0117333 | WO0245485 | WO2005017157 | WO2006136351 | US5969169 | US5840946 | US6323392 | US6063947 | US6270828 | US6169190 | US5965755 | US5434283 | - ELBERT; NAUEN, PEST MANAG SCI., (2000), vol. 56, pages 60 - 64 | - RAUCH; NAUEN, ARCH INSECTS BIOCHEM PHYSIOL., (2003), vol. 54, pages 165 - 176 | - GORMAN, LIU; DENHOLM, BRÜGGEN, NAUEN, PEST MANAG SCI., (2008), vol. 64, pages 1122 - 1125 | - R. WEGLER, Chemie der Pflanzenschutz- und Schädlingsbekämpfungsmittel, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1970), vol. 2, pages 401 - 412 | - COMAI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1983), vol. 221, pages 370 - 371 | - BARRY ET AL., CURR. TOPICS PLANT PHYSIOL., (1992), vol. 7, pages 139 - 145 | - SHAH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 233, pages 478 - 481 | - GASSER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 263, pages 4280 - 4289 | - TRANEL; WRIGHT, WEED SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 50, pages 700 - 712 | - CRICKMORE ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 62, pages 807 - 813 | - MOELLENBECK ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 19, pages 668 - 72 | - SCHNEPF ET AL., APPLIED ENVIRONM. MICROB., (2006), vol. 71, pages 1765 - 1774 | - ELBERT A; NAUEN R, "Bioassays for imidacloprid for a resistance monitoring against the whitefly Bemisia tabaci", PROC BRIGHTON CROP PROT CONF - PESTS AND DISEASES, (1996), vol. 2, pages 731 - 738 | - STUMPF N; NAUEN R, "Identification of biochemical markers linked to neonicotinoid crossresistance in Bemisia tabaci (Hemiptera: Aleyrodidae", ARCH INSECT BIOCHEM PHYSIOL, (2003), vol. 54, pages 165 - 176 | EP20070077984 | EP20060009836 | EP20040077624 | WO2007EP02433 |