EP2077241 - Container with lid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rehrig Pacific Company 4010 East 26th Street Los Angeles, CA 90058 / US | [2009/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hassell, Jon. P 351 Josephine Street Atlanta, GA 30307 / US | [2009/28] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/49] | Lamb, Richard Andrew Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambs. PE1 1JX / GB | ||
Former [2009/28] | Lamb, Richard Andrew Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 08172764.6 | 23.12.2008 | [2009/28] | Priority number, date | US20080968906 | 03.01.2008 Original published format: US 968906 | [2009/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2077241 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2077241 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/16 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
B65F1/16 (EP,US);
B65D43/164 (EP,US);
B65D2251/1083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2012/40] |
Former [2009/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Behälter mit Deckel | [2009/28] | English: | Container with lid | [2009/28] | French: | Récipient doté d'un couvercle | [2009/28] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 03.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6000576 (LIU CHING-RONG [TW]) [X] 8-10 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 6 * * figures 5,8,9 * [A] 1,11,12; | [XA]EP1116672 (FRITZ SCHAEFER GES MIT [DE]) [X] 8 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 1,9; | [A]GB2423762 (REHRIG PACIFIC CO [US]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * |