EP1964486 - Zip fastener end stop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takazawa, Shigeyoshi c/o YKK Europe Ltd. Whitehouse Industrial Estate Runcorn, Cheshire WA7 3BW / GB | 02 /
Davies, Mark c/o YKK Europe Ltd. Whitehouse Industrial Estate Runcorn, Cheshire WA7 3BW / GB | [2016/31] |
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
Takazawa, Shigeyoshi c/o YKK Europe Ltd. Whitehouse Industrial Estate Runcorn, Cheshire WA7 3BW / GB | ||
02 /
Davies, Mark c/o YKK Europe Ltd. Whitehouse Industrial Estate Runcorn, Cheshire WA7 3BW / GB | Representative(s) | Round, Edward Mark Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/36] | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08250374.9 | 31.01.2008 | [2008/36] | Priority number, date | GB20070003849 | 27.02.2007 Original published format: GB 0703849 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1964486 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1964486 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/32, A44B19/36, A44B19/60 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
A44B19/32 (EP,US);
A44B19/36 (EP,KR,US);
A44B19/26 (KR);
A44B19/60 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2595 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2596 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2016/31] |
Former [2009/19] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reißverschlussanschlag | [2008/36] | English: | Zip fastener end stop | [2008/36] | French: | Butée de fermeture à glissière | [2008/36] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 04.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1024733 (LIGHTNING FASTENERS LTD) [X] 1-10,15-23,25 * page 1, line 9 - page 3, line 61; figures 1-11 * [Y] 11-14,24; | [X]US3616939 (POTIN MARCEL) [X] 1-10,15,16,19-23 * column 1, line 4 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP1321062 (YKK CORP [JP]) [X] 1-10,15,16,20-23 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-9 *; | [Y]EP0345799 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]) [Y] 11-14,24 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 58; figures 1-11 *; | [PX]EP1772071 (YKK CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-25 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0072]; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US2005040559 (YANG SHIH SHENG [TW]) [A] 20-25 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-6 * | Examination | GB2190133 | EP1175842 | GB1478100 | by applicant | GB1270179 | US3616939 | GB1024733 | EP1321062 | EP0345799 | EP1772071 | US2005040559 | EP1057423 |