EP1959350 - Fusion memory device and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan3(sam)-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan3(sam)-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oh, Sung Jo c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3(sam)-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Boakes, Jason Carrington Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Boakes, Jason Carrington Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 08250423.4 | 05.02.2008 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | KR20070011618 | 05.02.2007 Original published format: KR 20070011618 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1959350 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1959350 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/76, H03M7/30 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
H03M7/30 (EP,US);
G06K19/07 (KR);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G06F12/06 (KR);
H04N19/423 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/34] | G06F15/76 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fusionsspeichervorrichtung und -verfahren | [2008/34] | English: | Fusion memory device and method | [2008/34] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de mémoire à fusion | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 16.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6145069 (DYE THOMAS A [US]) [X] 1-11 * column 1, line 15 - line 23; figure 3 * |