EP2001200 - Controlling vehicular electronics devices using physiological signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Min Hwa Hyundai Apt. 11-105 Apgujeong-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-787 / KR | [2008/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08251925.7 | 03.06.2008 | [2008/50] | Priority number, date | KR20070054497 | 04.06.2007 Original published format: KR 20070054497 | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2001200 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
G06Q50/40 (KR);
B60H1/00742 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/303 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Steuerung von elektronischen Fahrzeugverrichtungen unter Verwendung physiologischer Signale | [2008/50] | English: | Controlling vehicular electronics devices using physiological signals | [2008/50] | French: | Contrôle de dispositifs électroniques véhiculaires utilisant des signaux physiologiques | [2008/50] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 28.01.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |