|
09.11.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.08.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.07.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2013 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.06.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
12.06.2013 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2010 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2010 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2009 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
08.01.2009 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
22.10.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |