EP2025521 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kogure, Seiichi c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Ito, Yoichi c/o Core Elements Development Section Designing Center Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252652.6 | 08.08.2008 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | JP20070208806 | 10.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007208806 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2025521 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2025521 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41J11/00, B41J13/08, B41J15/04 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
B41J11/007 (EP,US);
B65H5/021 (EP,US);
B65H2301/532 (EP,US);
B65H2404/25 (EP,US);
B65H2601/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [2009/43] |
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2009/08] | English: | Image forming apparatus | [2009/08] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 27.10.2010 | ES | 07.02.2011 | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/30] | NL | 27.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1060897 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-9 * abstract *; | [X]WO2004108419 (RICOH KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-9* figure 1 * | by applicant | EP1060897 | JP2007208806 |