EP2030577 - Surgical instrument with articulation mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/10] | Surgical stapling appparatus | ||
[2013/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 60 Middletown Avenue North Haven, CT 06473 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marczyk, Stanislaw 113 A. River Bend Road Stratford, CT 06614 / US | 02 /
Cappola, Kenneth M. 70 Hurd Avenue Monroe, CT 06468 / US | 03 /
Maffei, Frank C. 19 Heather Ridge Shelton, CT 06484 / US | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Alcock, David, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Alcock, David, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | Alcock, David, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252877.9 | 29.08.2008 | [2009/10] | Priority number, date | US20070967169P | 31.08.2007 Original published format: US 967169 P | US20080200004 | 28.08.2008 Original published format: US 200004 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2030577 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2030577 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2030577 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/068 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00473 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07214 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/20] |
Former [2010/13] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chirurgisches Instrument mit Schwenkmechanismus | [2013/12] | English: | Surgical instrument with articulation mechanism | [2013/12] | French: | Instrument chirurgical avec mécanisme d'articulation | [2013/12] |
Former [2009/10] | Chirurgische Klammervorrichtung | ||
Former [2009/10] | Surgical stapling appparatus | ||
Former [2009/10] | Appareil d'agrafeuse chirurgicale | Examination procedure | 14.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12152138.9 / EP2446833 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2008 | AT | 16.10.2013 | BE | 16.10.2013 | BG | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | CZ | 16.10.2013 | DK | 16.10.2013 | EE | 16.10.2013 | FI | 16.10.2013 | HR | 16.10.2013 | LT | 16.10.2013 | LV | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | MT | 16.10.2013 | NL | 16.10.2013 | PL | 16.10.2013 | RO | 16.10.2013 | SE | 16.10.2013 | SI | 16.10.2013 | SK | 16.10.2013 | TR | 16.10.2013 | NO | 16.01.2014 | GR | 17.01.2014 | IS | 16.02.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.08.2008 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 16.10.2013 | |
NO | 16.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0807409 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 12 - column 10, line 27; figures 3,19,20 *; | [A]US5865361 (MILLIMAN KEITH L [US], et al) [A] 1* column 9, line 13 - line 31; figures 9,11,12 * | by applicant | US3079606 | US3490675 | US3499591 | US4429695 | US5040715 | US5065929 | US5307976 | US5312023 | US5318221 | US5326013 | US5332142 |