EP2152030 - MBMS handover triggering depending on the soft combining possibility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/06] | MBMS handover Auslösung depending on the soft combining possibility | ||
[2012/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone Group PLC Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | For all designated states Vodafone España, S.A. Avda. de Europa no. 1 28108 Alcobendas / ES | [2013/14] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Vodafone Group PLC Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | ||
For all designated states Vodafone España, S.A. Avda. de Eurpoa no. 1 28108 Alcobendas / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Exadaktylos, Kyriakos c/o Vodafone España, S.A.U. Avda. de Europa 1-Parkque Empresarial La Moraleja 28108 Alcobendas (Madrid) / ES | 02 /
Diaz, Maria c/o Vodafone España, S.A.U. Avda. de Europa 1-Parkque Empresarial La Moraleja 28108 Alcobendas (Madrid) / ES | 03 /
Frost, Tim c/o Vodafone España, S.A.U. Avda. de Europa 1-Parkque Empresarial La Moraleja 28108 Alcobendas (Madrid) / ES | 04 /
Di Viesti, Pasqueale c/o Vodafone España, S.A. Parque Empresarial Castellana Norte c/Isabel Colbrand, 22 28050 Madrid / ES | [2013/14] |
Former [2010/06] | 01 /
Exadaktylos, Kyriakos c/o Vodafone España, S.A.U. Avda. de Europa, 1-Parkque Empresarial La Moraleja 28108 Alcobendas (Madrid) / ES | ||
02 /
Diaz, Maria c/o Vodafone España, S.A.U. Avda. de Europa, 1-Parkque Empresarial La Moraleja 28108 Alcobendas (Madrid) / ES | |||
03 /
Frost, Tim c/o Vodafone España, S.A.U. Avda. de Europa, 1-Parkque Empresarial La Moraleja 28108 Alcobendas (Madrid) / ES | |||
04 /
Di Viesti, Pasqueale c/o Vodafone España, S.A. Parque Empresarial Castellana Norte c/Isabel Colbrand, 22 28050 Madrid / ES | Representative(s) | Ferrara, Simone, et al Vodafone Group Services Limited Group Legal Babbage House The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [2013/05] |
Former [2010/06] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 08380243.9 | 04.08.2008 | [2010/06] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2152030 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2152030 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06, // H04W72/00, H04W36/08, H04W4/12 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
H04W72/30 (EP);
H04W36/30 (US);
H04W36/0007 (EP);
H04W36/302 (EP);
H04W36/08 (EP);
H04W4/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/06] | H04W4/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/06] | Title | German: | MBMS Handover Auslösung abhängig von der Softkombinierungsmöglichkeit | [2012/51] | English: | MBMS handover triggering depending on the soft combining possibility | [2012/51] | French: | Déclenchement d'un changement de cellule pour un service MBMS en fonction des possibilités de combinaison de signaux | [2010/06] |
Former [2010/06] | MBMS Handover Bedarf abhängig von der Softkombinierungsmöglichkeit | ||
Former [2010/06] | MBMS handover Auslösung depending on the soft combining possibility | Examination procedure | 12.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 03.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 12.08.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 12.08.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2008 | AT | 03.04.2013 | BE | 03.04.2013 | CY | 03.04.2013 | CZ | 03.04.2013 | DK | 03.04.2013 | EE | 03.04.2013 | FI | 03.04.2013 | HR | 03.04.2013 | LT | 03.04.2013 | LV | 03.04.2013 | MC | 03.04.2013 | MT | 03.04.2013 | NL | 03.04.2013 | PL | 03.04.2013 | RO | 03.04.2013 | SE | 03.04.2013 | SI | 03.04.2013 | SK | 03.04.2013 | TR | 03.04.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | NO | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.07.2013 | IS | 03.08.2013 | IE | 04.08.2013 | LU | 04.08.2013 | PT | 05.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
TR | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
IE | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
IE | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 03.04.2013 | |
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 03.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1892892 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0005] - [0029] *; | [A] - PITSILLIDES ET AL, "MBMS Handover control: A new approach for efficient handover in MBMS enabled 3G cellular networks", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071030), vol. 51, no. 18, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 4897 - 4918, XP022322478 [A] 1-14 * 1. Introduction 2. Motivations for a new MBMS Handover approach 3. Proposed MBMS Handover control approach * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.comnet.2007.08.005 | [A] - CHRISTOPHOROS CHRISTOPHOROU ET AL, "An enhanced approach for efficient MBMS handovers in 3G networks", COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICATIONS, 2008. ISCC 2008. IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080706), ISBN 978-1-4244-2702-4, pages 362 - 367, XP031321400 [A] 1-14 * 2. MBMS handover: Main concept 3. Previous proposed approach deficiencies 4. Enhanced mbms handover approach * | [AD] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); User Equipment (UE) procedures in idle mode and procedures for cell reselection in connected mode (3GPP TS 25.304 version 7.6.0 Release 7); ETSI TS 125 304", ETSI STANDARD, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20080701), vol. 3-R2, no. V7.6.0, XP014042112 [AD] 1-14 * 5.2.6.1.4 Cell reselection criteria 5.2.6.1.5 Cell reselection parameters in system information broadcasts * | by applicant | EP1892892 | - "MBMS Handover control: A new approach for efficient handover in MBMS enabled 3G cellular networks", PITSILLIDES ET AL., COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., (200710), vol. 51, pages 4897 - 4918 |