EP2129807 - METHOD FOR THE REDUCTION OF A SLAG HAVING A HIGH DEGREE OF CHROMIUM IN AN ELECTRIC ARC FURNACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Siemag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REICHEL, Johann Bockumer Strasse 368 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
ROSE, Lutz Im alten Bruch 19 47259 Duisburg / DE | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2009/50] | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08701060.9 | 10.01.2008 | [2009/50] | WO2008EP00138 | Priority number, date | DE20071006529 | 09.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007006529 | [2009/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008095575 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2129807 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2129807 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C21C7/00, C21C5/52, C21C5/54 | [2009/50] | CPC: |
C21C5/527 (EP,US);
C21C7/00 (KR);
C21C5/52 (KR);
C21C5/54 (EP,KR,US);
C21C7/0087 (EP,US);
C21C2007/0062 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUKTION EINER HOCHCHROMHALTIGEN SCHLACKE IN EINEM ELEKTROLICHTBOGENOFEN | [2009/50] | English: | METHOD FOR THE REDUCTION OF A SLAG HAVING A HIGH DEGREE OF CHROMIUM IN AN ELECTRIC ARC FURNACE | [2009/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION D'UN LAITIER À HAUTE TENEUR EN CHROME DANS UN FOUR À ARC ÉLECTRIQUE | [2009/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 21.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2008 | CY | 12.09.2012 | CZ | 12.09.2012 | DK | 12.09.2012 | EE | 12.09.2012 | HR | 12.09.2012 | LT | 12.09.2012 | LV | 12.09.2012 | MT | 12.09.2012 | NL | 12.09.2012 | PL | 12.09.2012 | RO | 12.09.2012 | SI | 12.09.2012 | SK | 12.09.2012 | TR | 12.09.2012 | BG | 12.12.2012 | NO | 12.12.2012 | GR | 13.12.2012 | IE | 10.01.2013 | LU | 10.01.2013 | IS | 12.01.2013 | PT | 14.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
TR | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IE | 10.01.2013 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IE | 10.01.2013 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IE | 10.01.2013 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 12.09.2012 | |
NO | 12.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0655508 (SVILUPPO MATERIALI SPA [IT]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 34 * * claim 1 * [A] 1-4,6-13; | [AD]EP0829545 (USINOR SACILOR [FR], et al) [AD] 1-13 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 58 ** claim 1 *; | [XY]WO0014287 (UDDEHOLM TECHNOLOGY AKTIEBOLAG [SE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 24 - line 37 * * page 3, line 28 - page 4, line 4 * * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 19 * * page 6, line 1 - line 9 * * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 1 * * page 7, line 5 - page 7, line 11 * * claims 1,3-9 * [Y] 5; | [XDY]WO2004104232 (SMS DEMAG AG [DE], et al) [XD] 1-4,6-13 * abstract * * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 9 * * page 3, line 8 - line 33 * * page 4, line 12 - line 35 * * page 5, line 15 - line 20 * * page 6, line 8 - line 32 * * claims 1-6,9,10 * * figure 1 * [Y] 5; | [XP]DE102006004532 (SMS DEMAG AG [DE]) [XP] 1-4,6-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0017] * * claims 1,3,12-14 * * figure 1 * |