EP2111680 - AN OVERVOLTAGE AND/OR UNDERVOLTAGE PROTECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fong, See Ni n° 6 Jalan Kenanga SD 9/5D, Bandar Sri Damansara Kuala Lumpur, 52200 / MY | [2009/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/44] | Representative(s) | Chaillot, Geneviève Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Chaillot, Geneviève Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/44] | Chaillot, Geneviève Cabinet Chaillot B.P. No. 74 92703 Colombes Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08705036.5 | 17.01.2008 | [2009/44] | WO2008MY00002 | Priority number, date | MY20070000232 | 16.02.2007 Original published format: MY 0700232 | [2009/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008100129 | Date: | 21.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2111680 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/33 | [2009/44] | CPC: |
H02H3/334 (EP,US);
H02H3/207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/44] | Title | German: | ÜBERSPANNUNGS- UND/ODER UNTERSPANNUNGS-SCHUTZEINRICHTUNG | [2009/44] | English: | AN OVERVOLTAGE AND/OR UNDERVOLTAGE PROTECTION DEVICE | [2009/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA SURTENSION ET/OU LA SOUS-TENSION | [2009/44] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 06.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/07] | 25.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0044078 (LAM SHEIRCHUN [CN]) [X] 1-57 * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 12; figure 1 * | Examination | FR2643195 | US2004212935 |