|
27.07.2018 |
Closing of application |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
28.03.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2018 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2017 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2014 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.09.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.09.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2012 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.07.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2009 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
19.08.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
74 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
46 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
24 |