EP2074860 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING ADDRESS PREFIX INFORMATION ASSOCIATED WITH HANDOVER IN NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Revocation of patent | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIA, Yangsong Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzen, Guangdong / CN | 02 /
SARIKAYA, Behcet Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzen, Guangdong / CN | [2012/50] |
Former [2009/27] | 01 /
XIA, Yangsong Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzen, Guangdong / CN | ||
02 /
SARIKAYA, Behcet Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzen, Guangdong / CN | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/27] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08706692.4 | 18.02.2008 | [2009/27] | WO2008CN70319 | Priority number, date | US20070890318P | 16.02.2007 Original published format: US 890318 P | US20070940019P | 24.05.2007 Original published format: US 940019 P | US20070946719P | 27.06.2007 Original published format: US 946719 P | US20080022845 | 30.01.2008 Original published format: US 22845 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008101442 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2074860 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2074860 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/26, H04L29/12 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04L61/5084 (EP,US);
H04L2101/659 (EP,US);
H04L2101/668 (EP,US);
H04W36/0011 (US);
H04W36/0019 (EP);
H04W80/04 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/27] | H04Q7/38, H04L12/28, H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG VON ADRESSENPRÄFIXINFORMATION VERBUNDEN MIT HANDOVER IN NETZEN | [2009/27] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING ADDRESS PREFIX INFORMATION ASSOCIATED WITH HANDOVER IN NETWORKS | [2009/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE L'INFORMATION DE PRÉFIXE D'ADRESSE ASSOCIÉE AU TRANSFERT DANS LES RÉSEAUX | [2009/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 04.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Appeal following examination | 25.01.2013 | Appeal received No. T0468/13 | 24.01.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.02.2013 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 13.08.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: other kind of disposal | Divisional application(s) | EP12191350.3 / EP2566203 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.03.2014
07.07.2016
WITHDRAWN Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE Opponents representative Kribber, Klaus-Dieter Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [2016/33] |
Former [2014/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.03.2014
26.03.2014
ADMISSIBLE Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE Opponents representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | 25.04.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.11.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.07.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.04.2016 | 10.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.02.2016 | 17.02.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.06.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/32] | Appeal following opposition | 26.07.2016 | Appeal received No. T1758/16 | 13.10.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.06.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.02.2008 | BE | 19.06.2013 | BG | 19.06.2013 | CY | 19.06.2013 | CZ | 19.06.2013 | DK | 19.06.2013 | EE | 19.06.2013 | FI | 19.06.2013 | GR | 19.06.2013 | HR | 19.06.2013 | IS | 19.06.2013 | LT | 19.06.2013 | LV | 19.06.2013 | MC | 19.06.2013 | MT | 19.06.2013 | NL | 19.06.2013 | PL | 19.06.2013 | PT | 19.06.2013 | RO | 19.06.2013 | SE | 19.06.2013 | SI | 19.06.2013 | SK | 19.06.2013 | TR | 19.06.2013 | NO | 19.09.2013 | IE | 18.02.2014 | LU | 18.02.2014 | AT | 28.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | [2017/48] |
Former [2017/17] | HU | 18.02.2008 | |
BG | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IS | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PT | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
TR | 19.06.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
IE | 18.02.2014 | ||
LU | 18.02.2014 | ||
AT | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 18.02.2008 | |
BG | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IS | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PT | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
TR | 19.06.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
IE | 18.02.2014 | ||
LU | 18.02.2014 | ||
AT | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.02.2008 | |
BG | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IS | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PT | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
IE | 18.02.2014 | ||
AT | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 19.06.2013 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PT | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
IE | 18.02.2014 | ||
AT | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/30] | BG | 19.06.2013 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PT | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
IE | 18.02.2014 | ||
AT | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/29] | BG | 19.06.2013 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
IE | 18.02.2014 | ||
AT | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 19.06.2013 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
IE | 18.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
IE | 18.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
IE | 18.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
IE | 18.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | IT | 12.12.2012 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | IT | 12.12.2012 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | IT | 12.12.2012 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | IT | 12.12.2012 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | IT | 12.12.2012 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 19.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1679834 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16* paragraphs [0050] - [0070]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1684470 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0024] - [0036]; figure 3 *; | [X] - YOKOTA KDDI R&D LABORATORIES H ET AL, "Mobile IPv6 Fast Handovers for 3G CDMA Networks; draft-ietf-mipshop-3gfh-01.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20061023), vol. mipshop, no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015047946 [X] 1-16 * pages 10-17 * | [A] - HEEJIN JANG SAMSUNG AIT JUNGHOON JEE ETRI YOUN-HEE HAN KUT SOOHONG DANIEL PARK SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS JAESUN CHA ETRI, "Mobile IPv6 Fast Handovers over IEEE 802.16e Networks; draft-ietf-mipshop-fh80216e-01.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20070102), vol. mipshop, no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015049574 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN1484407 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]CN1543256 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]CN1875579 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]CN1879365 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]KR100694302B (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [A]KR20070061296 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [X] - RAJEEV KOODLI ET AL., "Fast Handovers for Mobile IPv6 draft-ietf-mobileip-fast-mipv6-08.txt", (20031010), pages 8 - 14, 32, XP008106232 |