EP2115527 - METHOD FOR OPTIMISING A SPECTACLE LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rodenstock GmbH Elsenheimerstrasse 33 80687 München / DE | [2012/48] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Rodenstock GmbH Isartalstrasse 43 80469 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESSER, Gregor Madelsederstrasse 1 81735 München / DE | 02 /
BECKEN, Wolfgang Werinherstrasse 28 81541 München / DE | 03 /
ALTHEIMER, Helmut An der Halde 2 87650 Baisweil-Lauchdorf / DE | 04 /
SEIDEMANN, Anne Lindwurmstrasse 42 80337 München / DE | 05 /
UTTENWEILER, Dietmar Walchstadter Strasse 25 82057 Icking / DE | 06 /
MÜLLER, Werner Waldstrasse 17 75443 Ötisheim / DE | 07 /
WEHNER, Edda Josef-Hebel-Strasse 31 82275 Emmering / DE | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/46] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08707297.1 | 25.01.2008 | [2009/46] | WO2008EP00588 | Priority number, date | DE20071003857 | 25.01.2007 Original published format: DE102007003857 | [2009/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008089999 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2115527 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2115527 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/02 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
G02C7/027 (EP,US);
G02C7/02 (EP,US);
G02C7/028 (EP,US);
G02C7/061 (EP,US);
G02C2202/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG EINES BRILLENGLASES | [2009/46] | English: | METHOD FOR OPTIMISING A SPECTACLE LENS | [2009/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION D'UN VERRE DE LUNETTES | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.01.2015
23.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH Gartenstrasse 97 73430 Aalen / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [2018/27] |
Former [2017/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.01.2015
23.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH Gartenstrasse 97 73430 Aalen / DE Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 DE-20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2015/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.01.2015
23.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH Gartenstrasse 97 73430 Aalen / DE Opponent's representative Wolf, Pfiz & Gauss Patentanwälte Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2015/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.01.2015
23.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH Gartenstrasse 97 73430 Aalen / DE Opponent's representative Gauss, Nikolai Wolf Pfiz & Gauss Patentanwälte Hauptmannsreute 93 DE-70193 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2015/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.01.2015
Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH Gartenstrasse 97 73430 Aalen / DE | 23.02.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.06.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.06.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/28] | Appeal following opposition | 02.06.2017 | Appeal received No. T1747/17 | 20.09.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.06.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 02.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2008 | CY | 16.04.2014 | CZ | 16.04.2014 | DK | 16.04.2014 | EE | 16.04.2014 | FI | 16.04.2014 | HR | 16.04.2014 | LT | 16.04.2014 | LV | 16.04.2014 | MC | 16.04.2014 | MT | 16.04.2014 | NL | 16.04.2014 | PL | 16.04.2014 | RO | 16.04.2014 | SE | 16.04.2014 | SI | 16.04.2014 | SK | 16.04.2014 | TR | 16.04.2014 | BG | 16.07.2014 | NO | 16.07.2014 | GR | 17.07.2014 | IS | 16.08.2014 | PT | 18.08.2014 | AT | 25.01.2015 | IE | 25.01.2015 | LU | 25.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/03] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
AT | 25.01.2015 | ||
IE | 25.01.2015 | ||
LU | 25.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
AT | 25.01.2015 | ||
IE | 25.01.2015 | ||
LU | 25.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
IE | 25.01.2015 | ||
LU | 25.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 16.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0192948 (INRAY LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,21,23-25 * page 9, line 28 - page 14, line 22; figure 2 * [Y] 7,13-20,22; | [XY]DE10313275 (RODENSTOCK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0027] * [Y] 7; | [Y]WO0184213 (RODENSTOCK OPTIK G [DE], et al) [Y] 13 * page 5, paragraph 3 *; | [Y]WO02088830 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 14-20,22 * page 18, line 2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 *; | [PX]DE102006030204 (RODENSTOCK GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-12,23-25 * the whole document *; | [PX]DE102005057533 (RODENSTOCK GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-12,23-25 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0192948 | DE10313275 | WO0184213 |