|
20.11.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2018 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.12.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
10.09.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
02.07.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.03.2018 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.2018 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.01.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.04.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.2014 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2014 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2014 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.07.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.12.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.07.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
04.02.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
14 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
20 |