|
29.11.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
11.09.2013 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.06.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2013 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.01.2013 |
Communication regarding a request to amend/correct the documents for grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2012 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
21.02.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2012 |
Decision on interlocutory revision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2012 |
Decision on interlocutory revision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
7 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Statement of grounds |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Statement of grounds |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.01.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.09.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
09.07.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.07.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.08.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.08.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
06.02.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
31 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |