EP2121338 - DUAL-SIDED TWO-PLY DIRECT THERMAL IMAGE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR Corporation 3097 Satellite Blvd. Duluth, GA 30096 / US | [2010/13] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states NCR Corporation 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORELAND, Richard NCR Corporation 9095 Washington Church Road Miamisburg, OH 45342 / US | 02 /
WEHR, Maryann NCR Corporation 9095 Washington Church Road Miamisburg, OH 45342 / US | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | MacLeod, Roderick William NCR Limited Architecture & Technology Discovery Centre 3 Fulton Road Dundee DD2 4SW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | MacLeod, Roderick William NCR Limited Architecture & Technology Discovery Centre 3 Fulton Road Dundee DD2 4SW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08709585.7 | 05.03.2008 | [2009/48] | WO2008GB00725 | Priority number, date | US20070682497 | 06.03.2007 Original published format: US 682497 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008107662 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2121338 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2121338 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/30, B41M5/34, B41M5/28, B41M3/14, B41M5/124, B41M3/10 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
B41M5/30 (EP,US);
B41J2/32 (EP,US);
B41J3/36 (EP,US);
B41J3/60 (EP,US);
B41J3/62 (EP,US);
B41M5/34 (EP,US);
B41M5/42 (EP,US);
G09F3/10 (EP,US);
B41M2205/04 (EP,US);
B41M2205/36 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | DOPPELSEITIGES, ZWEILAGIGES DIREKTWÄRMEBILDELEMENT | [2009/48] | English: | DUAL-SIDED TWO-PLY DIRECT THERMAL IMAGE ELEMENT | [2009/48] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'IMAGE THERMIQUE DIRECTE À DEUX PLIS, DOUBLE FACE | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 23.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.2010 | BE | 27.10.2010 | CY | 27.10.2010 | CZ | 27.10.2010 | DK | 27.10.2010 | EE | 27.10.2010 | FI | 27.10.2010 | HR | 27.10.2010 | HU | 27.10.2010 | LT | 27.10.2010 | LV | 27.10.2010 | MT | 27.10.2010 | NL | 27.10.2010 | PL | 27.10.2010 | RO | 27.10.2010 | SE | 27.10.2010 | SI | 27.10.2010 | SK | 27.10.2010 | TR | 27.10.2010 | BG | 27.01.2011 | NO | 27.01.2011 | GR | 28.01.2011 | IS | 27.02.2011 | PT | 28.02.2011 | IE | 05.03.2011 | LU | 05.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CY | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
TR | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
IE | 05.03.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CY | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
IE | 05.03.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
IE | 05.03.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
IE | 05.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
HR | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
NO | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5366952 (GRANQUIST RUSSELL E [US]) [X] 1-23 * figure 1; claims 1-4 * * column 2, line 28 - line 56 * * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 9 * * column 6, line 8 - line 34 *; | [PX]WO2007102879 (NCR CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-23 * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 3 * * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 4 * * page 3, line 12 - line 23 * * page 6, line 4 - line 11 * * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 28 ** figure 1A; claims 1-3 * | by applicant | US5366952 | US6759366 | US6784906 | US6803344 | WO2007102879 | US2007212146 | US2007211099 | US20060779781 | US20070678216 |