EP2118736 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING "WHATS'S NEXT" DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOME BOX OFFICE INC. 1100 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10036 / US | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUTTNER, Craig, D. 19 Ludlow Manor Norwalk, CT 06855 / US | 02 /
DIBARTOLOMEO, Jeffrey, A. 204 Fox Court Merrick, NY 11566 / US | 03 /
PROBST, Bruce 66 East Mount Airy Road Croton-on-hudson, NY 10520 / US | 04 /
BEYLER, John, Clayton 59 Orchard Ridge Road Chappaqua, NY 10514 / US | 05 /
STALLING, Lars C/Doctor Dou 10 3-1 E-08001 Barcelona / ES | 06 /
PARVIANEN, Juho Unit 29, Quebec Wharf 315 Kingsland Road E8 4DJ London / GB | 07 /
GRISHAVER, Alexander, Thompson 44 Shakespeare Street Daly City, CA 94014 / US | 08 /
GABRIEL, Michael 374 Sound Beach Avenue Old Greenwich, CT 06870 / US | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08713351.8 | 29.01.2008 | [2009/47] | WO2008US01251 | Priority number, date | US20070898369P | 29.01.2007 Original published format: US 898369 P | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008094616 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2118736 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/00, G06F17/30 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
G06F16/437 (EP,US);
G06F16/735 (EP,US);
G06F16/78 (EP,US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
H04N21/252 (EP,US);
H04N21/44224 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | G06F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON WHAT'S-NEXT-DATEN | [2009/47] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING "WHATS'S NEXT" DATA | [2009/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR FOURNIR DES DONNÉES QUE SE PASSE-T-IL ENSUITE | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 28.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/08] | 06.07.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.10.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5790935 (PAYTON DAVID W [US]) [A] 6 * column 5, lines 6-20; figures 2, 6 * * column 9, lines 14-26 *; | [X]WO0115449 (SINGULARIS S A [CH], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 5, line 2 - page 6, line 9 * * page 7, line 21 - page 13, line 13; figures 1-4 * * page 15, line 5 - page 19, line 15; figures 7, 8 *; | [X]EP1193976 (GIST COMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0050] - [0065]; figures 22-23 *; | [A]US2003126600 (HEUVELMAN JEROEN [US]) [A] 17 * paragraphs [0030] - [0048] *; | [A]US6636836 (PYO SOON-KYU [KR]) [A] 1-18* column 4, line 6 - column 8, line 9; figures 1-6 *; | [X]WO03098932 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 5, line 17 - page 14, line 25; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2004064296 (HOME BOX OFFICE [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005064941 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 16 * page 7, line 19 - page 11, line 25; figures 1-2 *; | [X]WO2007010443 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 3, line 25 - page 8, line 28; figures 1, 2 * | International search | [Y]US2002194585 (CONNELLY JAY H [US]); | [A]US2003021232 (DUPLAIX JEROME [CA], et al); | [Y]US2004088235 (ZIEKLE WILLIAM D [US], et al) | Examination | EP1044118 |