|
05.01.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.12.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.09.2017 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
21 |
|
07.04.2017 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
27 |
|
09.03.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.02.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
10 |
|
10.02.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.02.2017 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.08.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.07.2015 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2015 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.01.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
29 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
31.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.04.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2012 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2010 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.12.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2009 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
08.09.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.07.2009 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.07.2009 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.07.2009 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.07.2009 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.10.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.07.2008 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
17.07.2008 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
12 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |