|
18.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
11.06.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2021 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.04.2021 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2021 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2021 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2021 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.03.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.03.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.03.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2021 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2021 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2021 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
07.04.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 11 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 12 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 13 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.03.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
20.02.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
04.02.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.01.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
33 |
|
05.03.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 09 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 10 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Appeal |
29 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
24 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
55 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
45 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
47 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
55 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
13.12.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
29.09.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.08.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
27.03.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
19 |