Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2146917 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2146917



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 369
22.11.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
18.11.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.11.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
06.11.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 6
06.11.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
13.09.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
30.07.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
24.07.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
11.07.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.07.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.03.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
20.11.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
23.07.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.05.2018 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 4
12.05.2017 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
26.01.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.01.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 3
27.09.2016 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.09.2016 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
03.08.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
03.08.2016 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
25.07.2016 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
22.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
22.07.2016 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
02.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.05.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.05.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.05.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.05.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
18.05.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
18.05.2016 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
18.05.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
18.05.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.05.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.05.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2016 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
18.05.2016 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.03.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2016 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
21.03.2016 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
21.03.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.02.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
29.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.10.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.10.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.10.2015 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.10.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
12.10.2015 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.10.2015 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.10.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2015 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.07.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.07.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
29.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.06.2015 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
27.02.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
27.02.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.01.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.01.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
23.01.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
23.01.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.01.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.01.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
23.01.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.04.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
27.03.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.03.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
11.03.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
11.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.01.2014 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 3
13.01.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
07.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.12.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.12.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.12.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.12.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 25
19.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.11.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
19.11.2013 Description Search / examination 2
19.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.11.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.11.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
02.10.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.01.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
08.01.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 13
08.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
08.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.01.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.09.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
06.09.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.02.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.02.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.12.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.11.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
07.10.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
01.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.09.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
29.07.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.11.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
13.11.2008 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
16.10.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
25.09.2008 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 26
12.09.2008 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
20.05.2008 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
20.05.2008 Claims International Searching Authority 2
20.05.2008 Description International Searching Authority 17
20.05.2008 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
20.05.2008 Drawings International Searching Authority 5