|
15.05.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.06.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
12.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2017 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2016 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.04.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.01.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2015 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.03.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.10.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2013 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Statement of grounds |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2012 |
Statement of grounds |
Appeal |
19 |
|
24.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.03.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.01.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.03.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.11.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.09.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2008 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
28 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |