EP2131763 - IRIS VALVE WITH NOVEL LOCKING MECHANISM AND CONTROL RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | [2017/45] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKMAN, Andrew T. 676 Wilfert Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45245 / US | 02 /
MINNELLI, Patrick J. 103 Burk Lane Harrison, Ohio 45030 / US | 03 /
NGUYEN, Anthony T. 8571 Rupp Farm Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 04 /
BAXTER, III, Chester O. 6229 Fairwind Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 05 /
D'ARCANGELO, Michele Via Benedetto Croce 26 I-00142 Rome / IT | [2009/51] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2018/01] |
Former [2009/51] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08730139.6 | 19.02.2008 | [2009/51] | WO2008US54278 | Priority number, date | US20070677820 | 22.02.2007 Original published format: US 677820 | US20070677809 | 22.02.2007 Original published format: US 677809 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008103655 | Date: | 28.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2131763 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2131763 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61B17/00 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
A61B17/3423 (EP);
A61B17/3498 (EP);
A61B17/3462 (EP);
A61B2017/00265 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/01] |
Former [2009/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | IRISVENTIL MIT NEUEM SPERRMECHANISMUS UND KONTROLLRING | [2009/51] | English: | IRIS VALVE WITH NOVEL LOCKING MECHANISM AND CONTROL RING | [2009/51] | French: | VANNE DE TYPE IRIS À MÉCANISME DE VERROUILLAGE ET BAGUE DE CONTRÔLE NOUVEAUX | [2009/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18150082.8 / EP3360493 | EP20176636.7 / EP3730077 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2008 | AT | 03.01.2018 | CY | 03.01.2018 | CZ | 03.01.2018 | DK | 03.01.2018 | EE | 03.01.2018 | FI | 03.01.2018 | HR | 03.01.2018 | LT | 03.01.2018 | LV | 03.01.2018 | MC | 03.01.2018 | PT | 03.01.2018 | RO | 03.01.2018 | SE | 03.01.2018 | SI | 03.01.2018 | SK | 03.01.2018 | TR | 03.01.2018 | IE | 19.02.2018 | LU | 19.02.2018 | MT | 19.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | BG | 03.04.2018 | NO | 03.04.2018 | GR | 04.04.2018 | IS | 03.05.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
MT | 19.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
MT | 19.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
LV | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
HR | 03.01.2018 | ||
LT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NO | 03.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004054353 (TAYLOR SCOTT [US]) [A] 1-3* paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0081] *; | [A]US2005222582 (WENCHELL THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] *; | [X]US2006247500 (VOEGELE JAMES W [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-11,14-23,26-40 * paragraph [0203] * * paragraph [0213] - paragraph [0214] * |